National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Seagate Technology, Inc.

Case Number: 5:2004cv01593
Filed: April 23, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 439 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 6, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
August 5, 2013 436 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING IMMEDIATE HEARING re 435 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Compelling Arbitration of Remaining Disputes and Entering Judgment filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Underwriters Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 23, 2013 434 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
June 21, 2013 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN PART re 402 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Breach of Contract Against National Union filed by Seagate Technology, Inc., 401 MOTION To Reinstate Final Judgment fi led by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Underwriters Insurance Company Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2013 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 21, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 30, 2013 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 402 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Breach of Contract Against National Union filed by Seagate Technology, Inc., 401 MOTION To Reinstate Final Judgment file d by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Underwriters Insurance Company, ORDER AND REPORT CONCLUDING SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 402 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Bre ach of Contract Against National Union, 401 MOTION To Reinstate Final Judgment . Responses due by 6/4/2013. Replies due by 6/10/2013. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 30, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/30/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2013 414 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING ACTION - Motions terminated: 402 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Breach of Contract Against National Union filed by Seagate Technology, Inc., 401 MOTION To Reinstate Final Judgment filed by N ational Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Underwriters Insurance Company., Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 7, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
April 5, 2013 398 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
March 27, 2013 396 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 379 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, 394 Order on Motion to Vacate,. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 27, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013) Modified on 3/27/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup denying 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
January 25, 2013 380 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
December 21, 2012 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL re 371 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Documents Related to Their Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, American International Underwriters Insurance Company, 367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Seagate Technology, Inc. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
October 11, 2012 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 11, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 12, 2012 359 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 358 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
August 2, 2012 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 2, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
February 17, 2011 343 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Appeal re 341 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
September 2, 2010 324 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Certification For Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) re 323 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
March 12, 2010 319 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 317 Stipulation Regarding Amount of Prejudgment Interest Owed by AISLIC According to July 9, 2009 Order filed by American International Specialty Lines Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
January 11, 2010 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT re 306 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Accordingly, on or before 1 /15/2010, noon the parties shall file a Joint Status Report updating the Court on the status of this 2004 case and show cause why the parties have failed, for nearly six months, to advance the case by contacting Judge Lloyd's Chambers pursua nt to the Court's Order. The Court may require the parties to appear at a subsequent Conference upon reviewing theparties' Joint Status Report. Failure to comply with this Order may warrant appropriate sanctions upon all parties. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 23, 2009 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDERING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 23, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 10, 2008 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference. Joint Status Statement or Proposed Judgment due 1/16/2009. If the Proposed Judgment is filed, the Status Conference will be vacated. The Court encourages the parties to continue to work in good faith to meet the Courts deadlines. Status Conference set for 1/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
September 24, 2008 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg for Settlement, SCHEDULING HEARING FOR CROSS MOTIONS RE RULE: 54(b) Judgment. The parties shall contact Judge Seeborg's chambers within ten days from the date of this order to set up the settlement conference. Motions to be filed in accordance to the local rules. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/23/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Seagate Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?