Preminger v. Principi et al

Plaintiff: Steven R. Preminger and Santa Clara County Democratic Central Committee
Defendant: Anthony Principi, Elizabeth Freeman, Karen Girton, Sacha Poulenz, Myrel Willeford and James Nicholson
Movant: Scott J Rafferty
Case Number: 5:2004cv02012
Filed: March 17, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2010 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 268 , 270 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND/OR TO WAIVE FILING FEES. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
May 21, 2010 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 262 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DECLARATORY AND EQUITABLE RELIEF PURSUANT TO FREEDMAN V. MARYLAND, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PURSUANT TO RULE 60(b). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/21/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
April 13, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 263 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
March 17, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 258 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CITATION TO CITIZENS UNITED. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/17/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
September 24, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING 255 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 25, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT 234 , 237 , ATTORNEYS' FEES 238 , AND SANCTIONS 80 , 134 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/25/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
May 8, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SCOPE OF HEARING SET ON MAY 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/8/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Preminger v. Principi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven R. Preminger
Represented By: Scott Joseph Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Clara County Democratic Central Committee
Represented By: Scott Joseph Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Principi
Represented By: Owen Peter Martikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Freeman
Represented By: Owen Peter Martikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Girton
Represented By: Owen Peter Martikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacha Poulenz
Represented By: Owen Peter Martikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrel Willeford
Represented By: Owen Peter Martikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Nicholson
Represented By: Owen Peter Martikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Scott J Rafferty
Represented By: Scott Joseph Rafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?