Eagle Emblems, Inc. et al v. Dell et al

Plaintiff: Eagle Emblems, Inc. and J & S Surplus
Defendant: Dell, Dell, U.S.A., Dell Computer Corporation, Dell Marketing Corporation and Unisys Corporation
Case Number: 5:2004cv03175
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 70 Continuing CMC: Case Management Conference set for 6/10/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/4/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 7, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 64 Regarding Continuance of Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/7/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 26, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 58 to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/26/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 2, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Stipulation filed by Unisys Corporation, Dell Computer Corporation, Dell, Dell Marketing Corporation, Dell, U.S.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/2/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
August 19, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court *E-FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCUMENT NO. 62* STIPULATION AND ORDER 58 Regarding Continuance of Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2010 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/19/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009) Modified on 2/26/2010 (jg, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 56 Continuing Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/19/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle Emblems, Inc. et al v. Dell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Emblems, Inc.
Represented By: David Russell Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & S Surplus
Represented By: David Russell Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell
Represented By: John Christophe Kirke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, U.S.A.
Represented By: John Christophe Kirke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Computer Corporation
Represented By: John Christophe Kirke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Marketing Corporation
Represented By: John Christophe Kirke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: John Christophe Kirke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?