Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Micrus Corporation

Case Number: 5:2004cv04072
Filed: September 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2008 218 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Micrus Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) and 41(c) re 217 Stipulation filed by Micrus Corporation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/8/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
September 25, 2008 216 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER To Extend Micrus Corp's Time to Respond to BSC/Target's Reply & Counterclaims to Micrus' First Amended Answer & Countercaims re 215 Stipulation filed by Micrus Corporation. Deadline to respond by 10/30/2008 or further request for extension to be filed. If stipulated dismissal is filed prior to that all further deadlines will be vacated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 5, 2008 213 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline to Reply re 212 Stipulation filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Target Therapeutics, Inc. Reply due 9/8/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. Micrus Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?