Piotr Gardias v. San Jose State University

Case Number: 5:2004cv04086
Filed: September 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2009 366 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/31/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
September 29, 2008 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Administratively Closing Cases. Consolidated cases C04-04768HRL, C05-01242HRL, C05-01833HRL, and C06-04695HRL shall be administratively closed. Consolidated Case No. C04-04086HRL remains open. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/29/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
February 7, 2008 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Following Status Conference. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file motion to compel discovery (#311) is denied. Plaintiff's request for order compelling defendant to pay for his copy of the January 2008 deposition transcript (#317) i s denied. Plaintiff's request for extension to file opposition to summary judgment (#312) is denied as moot. Deadline for plaintiff to review/correct January 2008 deposition transcript: 3/11/2008. Deadline for defendant to file motion for sum mary judgment: 3/11/2008. Plaintiff's opposition due by 4/15/2008. Defendant's reply due by 4/29/2008. Motion hearing set for 5/13/2008, 10:00 AM. Plaintiff given second notice pursuant to Rand v. Rowland, 154 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 1998). Final pretrial conference set for 7/22/2008, 1:30 PM. Start of bench trial (estimated 5 days): 7/28/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/8/2008. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piotr Gardias v. San Jose State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?