IN RE:INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG SECURITIES LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2004cv04156
Filed: September 30, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2011 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING CO-LEAD COUNSEL ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/2/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 24, 2011 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 24, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
July 15, 2011 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/15/11. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 9, 2011 345 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
April 21, 2011 343 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 342 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 342 Stipulation: The Court sets July 11, 2011 at 9 a.m. as a hearing on Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. The parties shall file their Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of Court. *** Deadlines terminated re 341 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/21/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 4, 2011 338 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING re 337 Stipulation. The request to continue the hearing from March 21, 2011 to April 4, 2011 is DENIED due to the Court's own unavailability. The motion remains on calendar for hearing on March 21, 2011 at 9:00 AM as previously set. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
December 2, 2010 325 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Extending Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint re 324 Stipulation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 324 Stipulation. Motion deadline 12/10/2010. Oppositions due by 1/24/2011. Reply due by 2/14/2011. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
September 15, 2010 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING ON ANTICIPATED MOTION. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. The Court continues the 9/20/2010 case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2010. Case Management Confere nce set for 11/1/2010 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Plaintiffs shall notice their Motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Please see the Court's Order re further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 2, 2010 308 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference to September 20, 2010 re 307 Stipulation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 24, 2010 305 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 304 USCA Order. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
April 28, 2009 289 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE PLAN re 288 Stipulation. the parties shall file with the Court a proposed form of class notice and a jointproposal for dissemination of notice on or before May 11, 2009. This is the parties' final continuance. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 10, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE PLAN re 286 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/10/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
March 13, 2009 283 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FINDING AS MOOT re 277 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/13/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
December 11, 2008 274 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT to Continue Hearing on Motions 235 , 237], 250 from 12/16/2008 to 1/09/2009 re 271 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, 272 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/11/2008. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 21, 2008 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference. The Court VACATES the case management conference set for 10/27/2008. To the extent that the parties have case management issues requiring the Court's attention, the parties may make a verbal request for a conference at the 12/15/2008 hearing on the parties' motions. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/21/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE:INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?