Sandisk Corporation v. STMicroelectronics, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv04379
Filed: October 15, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 332 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 331 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/22/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 14, 2009 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE (approving 327 ). The Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 is CONTINUED to 11/20/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 10, 2009 328 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR BENCH TRIAL ON INEQUITABLE CONDUCT re 326 . Bench Trial set for 1/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/1/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
May 19, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 284 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND 286 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the Third Amended Complaint. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
September 10, 2008 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 266 MOTION for Leave to Bring Posters and Easel into Courtroom. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/9/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 5, 2008 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 214 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply Papers Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/5/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 4, 2008 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 202 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Opposition to SanDisk Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/3/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
February 7, 2008 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 151 Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order filed by STMicroelectronics NV, Sandisk Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandisk Corporation v. STMicroelectronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?