Giuseppe Campanella, et al v. Lynette Longoria, et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv04906
Filed: November 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2009 298 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 12, 2009 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' DEPOSITION EXCERPTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/12/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 8, 2009 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION EXCERPTS OF MILAGROS YOUNG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/8/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
December 31, 2008 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/31/08. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008)
December 24, 2008 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO BRING CERTAIN EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM re 262 filed by Dustin Davis, Oberlander, Jeffrey Longoria, Duke Marino, County of Santa Clara, James Cardenas. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/24/08. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giuseppe Campanella, et al v. Lynette Longoria, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?