The United States of America, for the use and Benefit of Summers Group, Inc. v. Mid Valley Electric and Communications, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2004cv05458
Filed: December 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2011 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 82 for Dismissal of Entire Action, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/16/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
May 19, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL re 77 . Bench Trial set for 10/31/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
July 2, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 61 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE. The Status Conference set for 7/10/2009 is CONTINUED to 8/14/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/1/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America, for the use and Benefit of Summers Group, Inc. v. Mid Valley Electric and Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?