Juarez v. Director of Corrections

Case Number: 5:2005cv00019
Filed: January 3, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Request for Certificate of Appealability as Untimely. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/5/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
April 15, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 53 Motion for Rehearing. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
September 11, 2008 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Denying 49 Motion to Dismiss on Double Jeopardy Grounds. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez v. Director of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?