Hayes v. William et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00070
Filed: January 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 09/15/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
July 6, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE. Signed by Judge Whyte on 07/06/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
December 4, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 41 to Continue Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/4/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
October 28, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 36 Regarding Continuation of ENE Conference. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. William et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?