Carramerica Realty Corp. v. NVIDIA Corporation et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00428
Filed: January 28, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/29/10. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
January 27, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Permitting NVIDIA to Bring Laptop Computer Into the Courtroom For February 1 Hearing re 256 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/27/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
November 4, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT NVIDIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS CARRAMERICA'S FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS re 233 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/4/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 19, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RENOTICE HEARING FROM 11/2/2009 TO 12/14/2009 re 221 Renotice motion hearing, 219 Renotice motion hearing, 220 Renotice motion hearing, 222 Renotice motion hearing; ADVANCING HEARING re 216 MOTIO N for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 221 Renotice motion hearing,, 219 Renotice motion hearing, 220 Renotice motion hearing, 222 Renotice motion hearing, 216 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
July 8, 2009 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Amended Complaint (in 5:05-cv-00428-JW) due by 8/10/2009. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2009 09:00 AM; Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
February 3, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 190 USCA Order. Joint Case Management Conference Statement due 2/27/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carramerica Realty Corp. v. NVIDIA Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?