Losoya -v- Woodford

Case Number: 5:2005cv00509
Filed: February 3, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SERVICE ON UNSERVED DEFENDANTS; REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM PBSP LITIGATION COORDINATOR; DISMISSING SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
November 12, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AGAINST UNSERVED DEFENDANTS UNDER RULE 4(m). Defendants Danial; Delaunay; Gensaw; George; Green; Holt; Keely; Kirby; Moore; Navarro; Nelson; Owen; Preston; Romero; Simmons; Smith; Wilcy; Young; Cardenas and Cortez terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/7/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
September 10, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Service on Defendants. The clerk of the Court is instructed to send a copy of this order to the Litigation Coordinator at PBSP, to comply with Court's request to provide information regarding defendants who are no longer at the facility. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/25/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008) Modified on 9/10/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Losoya -v- Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?