Leonard et al v Bimbo Bakeries, USA, Inc, et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv00829
Filed: February 25, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2010 489 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Appear by Telephone for the 2/8/2010 Preliminary Approval Hearing re 488 Stipulation; Finding as Moot 487 Stipulation to Continue the 2/8/2010 Preliminary Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
December 16, 2009 478 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing for Preliminary Approval of Settlement from 12/21/2009 to 1/25/2010 re 477 Amended Document. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 7, 2009 475 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Hearing from 12/14/2009 to 12/21/2009 re 474 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/7/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 3, 2009 473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT re 472 Status Report. The Court VACATES the 12/7/2009 conference and sets a Motion Hearing on 12/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. On or before 12/7/2009, the parties shall file all necessary briefs and proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 12, 2009 471 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE RE SETTLEMENT re 470 Status Report. On or before 11/16/2009, the parties shall either file a Joint Status Report to update the Court or file the appropriate Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement. Status Conference set for 12/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 23, 2009 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE re 468 Status Report. Joint Status Report Statement or deadline to file the appropriate Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement due 11/6/2009. Status Conference set for 11/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
September 30, 2009 467 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATION MOTIONS; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 30, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 11, 2009 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION PROCEEDINGS AND DEFERRING RULING ON MOTION re 463 Status Report, 462 Status Report. Signed by Judge James Ware on 09/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 3, 2009 461 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 460 Status Report. By 9/9/2009, the parties report to the Courtconcerning the status of settlement negotiations. The Court will continue to withhold decision on the three certification-related motions until 9/11/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 20, 2009 459 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STATUS REPORT FOR ADDITIONAL TIME RE SETTLEMENT re 458 Status Report. The parties are to report to the Court concerning the status of settlement negotiations by 8/31/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009) Modified docket text on 8/21/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2009 457 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 456 Stipulation. Status Report due by 8/12/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
January 21, 2009 419 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 418 Stipulation, filed by Chris Herr, Kathleen Morrison, Bob Jeter, Gary Castro, Anthony Mott, Larry Brian Newman, Jr., Gary Hoskins, William F. Harrison, Thomas Leonard, Charlie Bradaric, Tom Teruso. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 21, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 9, 2009 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO REMOVAL CASE FROM COURTS EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION PROGRAM re 414 ADR Request. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/9/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
November 13, 2008 408 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND RELATED MOTIONS re 405 Case Management Statement, 407 Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2008 is VACATED. The parties a re ordered to comply with the following: Hearing set for ANTICIPATED PLAINTIFFS' MOTION on 1/26/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose AND Hearing set for ANTICIPATED PLAINTIFFS' and ANTICIPATED DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS on 3/2/20 09 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall notice and file their motions in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. All discovery disputes re class certification are referred to the referral Magistrate Judge. Please see order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/13/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard et al v Bimbo Bakeries, USA, Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?