Compression Labs Inc. v. Creo Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Compression Labs Inc.
Defendant: Creo America's Inc. and Creo Inc.
Case Number: 5:2005cv01603
Filed: April 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/4/07. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 1, 2007 7
Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 6/1/2007 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 6/1/2007). The Court dismisses this case and all related cases. The Court shall issue 90-day dismissal orders. (Court Reporter Jana Ridenour.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2007)
August 30, 2006 6
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2006 at 10:00 AM. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2006)
August 12, 2005 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 8/12/05. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2005)
August 10, 2005 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 10, 2005. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF)
August 9, 2005 3 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 8/9/05. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2005)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compression Labs Inc. v. Creo Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creo America's Inc.
Represented By: William P. DiSalvatore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creo Inc.
Represented By: John M. Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compression Labs Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?