Advantica Inc. v. Gold Wing Engineering et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv01709
Filed: April 26, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 motion for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/26/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 4, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT, ORDER, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/4/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 24, 2010 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing on 107 Order to Show Cause to March 26, 2010. Signed by Judge Whyte on 2/24/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 3, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re dismissal. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM. Plaintiff shall file request for dismissal or motion to enforce settlement and declaration explaining failure to comply with court's 9/4/09 order by 2/16/2010. Signed by Judge Whyte on 2/3/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
June 18, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 98 Motion for Administrative Relief to allow plaintiff to file reply brief. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
March 5, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 73 Amending Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order Jury Trial set for 6/22/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/5/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 21, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pretrial Scheduling 71 Jury Trial set for 5/26/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Fact Discovery cutoff 12/19/2008. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advantica Inc. v. Gold Wing Engineering et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?