Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that defendant Google Inc. has failed to take any significant measures to track or prevent click fraud, to adequately warn its customers about the existence of click fraud, to adequately advise customers that they have been victimized by click fraud, and to refund customers the excess charges that they have incurred as a result of the click fraud.

Plaintiff: Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc. and Steve Mizera
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2005cv02579
Filed: June 24, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2007 45 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/25/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2007)
December 7, 2006 44 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: 43 Dismissing Action, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/7/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2006)
April 14, 2006 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Gregory K. Keller. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2006 41
APPLICATION of Gregory E. Keller for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc.. (fee paid)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2006 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte Regarding Stay Request (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
March 30, 2006 37 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte Regarding Stay Request (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2006)
March 22, 2006 36
Proposed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc. as Named Plaintiff by Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc.. (Kaplan, Darren) (Filed on 3/22/2006)
February 6, 2006 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2006)
February 2, 2006 33
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Google, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 2/2/2006)
January 26, 2006 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Consolidate Actions. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/13/06. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2006)
January 18, 2006 31
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/13/2006 before Ronald M. Whyte re 23 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Click Defense, Inc.,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF)
December 29, 2005 30
Reply to Opposition re 23 MOTION to Substitute Party filed byClick Defense, Inc.. (Kaplan, Darren) (Filed on 12/29/2005)
December 23, 2005 29
Proposed Order re 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Click Defense's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Representative Plaintiff by Google, Inc.. (Silbert, David) (Filed on 12/23/2005)
December 7, 2005 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2006 10:30 AM. Class Certification Hearing set for 5/12/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/7/05. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2005)
December 1, 2005 22
Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/28/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2006 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Nopt Reported.) (jg, COURT STAFF)
November 15, 2005 21
Proposed Order [Proposed] Case Management Order by Google, Inc.. (Durie, Daralyn) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
October 18, 2005 20
Defendant Google, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Class Action Complaint byGoogle, Inc.. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 17, 2005 19
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Google, Inc.. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 10/17/2005)
September 14, 2005 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 8 Motion to Dismiss, finding as moot 14 Motion to enlarge time (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
September 2, 2005 17
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/2/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 9/2/2005) re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.,. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, Court Staff) (Date Filed: 9/2/2005)
August 24, 2005 16
Proposed Order re 14 MOTION to Enlarge Time re 10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Click Defense, Inc.. (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 8/24/2005)
August 23, 2005 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re [9] Granting MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice tor attorney Darren T. Kaplan filed by Click Defense, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on August 23, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2005)
August 22, 2005 12
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 11 Reply Memorandum (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 8/22/2005)
August 19, 2005 11
Reply Memorandum re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byGoogle, Inc.. (Kent, Ryan) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
July 27, 2005 8
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 7/27/2005)
July 26, 2005 5
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc.. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 7/26/2005)
July 22, 2005 4
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google, Inc. re 1 Complaint,, 2 ADR Scheduling Order, 3 Certificate of Interested Entities (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2005)
June 28, 2005 3
Certificate of Interested Entities OR Parties (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Internet Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory E. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Mizera
Represented By: Shawn Khorrami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David Jason Silbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?