Google, Inc. et al v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiffs Google Inc. and Kai-Fu Lee sought judicial relief from a non-compete provision drafted by Dr. Lee's former employer, Microsoft Corporation.

Plaintiff: Google, Inc. and Kai-Fu Lee
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 5:2005cv03095
Filed: July 29, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2005 Filing 34
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Google, Inc., Kai-Fu Lee. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 12/27/2005)
October 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33
ORDER by Judge Whyte deferring ruling on 15 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 22 Motion to Stay (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2005)
October 14, 2005 Filing 32
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2005 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 10/14/2005) re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer or Stay filed by Microsoft Corporation,, 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google, Inc.,, Kai-Fu Lee,. (Court Reporter Christine Bedard.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2005)
August 29, 2005 Filing 20
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google, Inc., Kai-Fu Lee. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 8/29/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 19
Proposed Order re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Google, Inc., Kai-Fu Lee. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jg, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/24/2005)
August 15, 2005 Filing 12
RESPONSE to Microsoft Corporation's Notice of Pendency of Other Action (Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-13) by Google, Inc., Kai-Fu Lee. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 11, 2005 Filing 11
ANSWER to Complaint byMicrosoft Corporation. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
August 2, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge. Signed by Executive Committee on August 2, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2005)
August 1, 2005 Filing 4
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Google, Inc., Kai-Fu Lee and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 8/1/2005)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google, Inc. et al v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai-Fu Lee
Represented By: Stephen E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Marie Schull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?