Heston et al v. City of Salinas et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv03658
Filed: September 12, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING re 429 USCA Memorandum, Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
April 30, 2009 425 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS with Prejudice Mike Dominici, Daniel Ortega, Craig Fairbanks, James Godwin, Lek Livingston, Valentin Paredez, Juan Ruiz, Tim Simpson, City of Salinas, Salinas Police Department re 423 Stipulation. Defendants Salinas Police Department, James Godwin, Tim Simpson, Craig Fairbanks, James Godwin; Lek Livingston, Daniel Ortega, Valentin Paredez, Juan Ruiz, City of Salinas and Mike Dominici terminated.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/28/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
March 13, 2009 420 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. The clerk may enter the sum of $50,000 as costs in the judgment by mutual agreement of the parties, at an interest rate of 0.43% annually re 415 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/13/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009) Modified on 3/16/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2009 402 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 30, 2009. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heston et al v. City of Salinas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?