Fisher v. The Anderson Behel Steven Creek Porche Audi Employee Benefit Plan et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv03790
Filed: September 20, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 24, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 94 Re: Satisfaction of Judgment and Request for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/24/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
October 6, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT remanding. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/5/2008. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 18, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 89 to Continue Case Management Conference:Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/18/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. The Anderson Behel Steven Creek Porche Audi Employee Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?