United States of America v. In the Matter of Tax Liabilities of: John Does Featured Case

The Internal Revenue Service (IRS) seeks authorization under Section 7602 of the Internal Revenue Code to issue a \"John Doe\" summons to PayPal, Inc. The summons seeks the account records for persons or entities having a U.S. address, telephone number or social security number, and where the source or destination of account funds from Jan 1, 1999-Dec 31, 2004, was a bank account at or a credit, charge or debit card issued by a financial institution in Anguilla, Antigua and Barbuda, Aruba, Bahamas, Barbados, Belize, Bermuda, British Virgin Islands, Cayman Islands, Cook Islands, Costa Rica, Cyprus, Dominca, Gibraltar, Grenada, Guernsey/Sark/Alderney, Hong Kong, Isle of Man, Jersey, Latvia, Liechtenstein, Luxembourg, Malta, Nauru, Netherlands Antilles, Panama, Samoa, St. Kitts and Nevis, St. Loucia, St. Vincent and the Grenadines, Singapore, Switzerland, Turks and Caicos and Vanuatu.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: In the Matter of Tax Liabilities of: John Does
Case Number: 5:2005cv04167
Filed: October 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2007 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Stipulation Enforcing John Doe Summons re 23 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/1/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 31, 2007 24
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 23 Stipulation and Proposed Order (Janik, Anton) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
April 4, 2006 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Ware on April 4, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
March 28, 2006 21
NOTICE by United States of America THAT NO FURTHER ACTION IS NECESSARY IN THIS PROCEEDING (Janik, Anton) (Filed on 3/28/2006)
March 27, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge James Ware on March 27, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2006)
February 28, 2006 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2006)
February 24, 2006 17
Proposed Order re 16 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct 15 Order by United States of America. (Janik, Anton) (Filed on 2/24/2006)
February 21, 2006 15 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SERVE "JOHN DOE" SUMMONS. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 21, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2006)
January 31, 2006 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 31, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 30, 2006 13
Declaration of Barbara Kallenberg in Support of 12 Response ( Non Motion ) to December 19, 2005 Order filed byUnited States of America. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Janik, Anton) (Filed on 1/30/2006)
December 19, 2005 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE: PETITION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE "JOHN DOE" SUMMONS by Judge James Ware (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2005)
November 18, 2005 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Ware for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Patricia V Trumbull remains as the referral judge. Signed by Executive Committee on November 18, 2005. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2005)
November 16, 2005 7
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by United States of America and Request for Reassignment to United States District Judge. (Janik, Anton) (Filed on 11/16/2005)
October 14, 2005 6
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2006 02:00 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/20/2005 (bw, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. In the Matter of Tax Liabilities of: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jay Robert Weill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: In the Matter of Tax Liabilities of: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?