Narayan et al v. EGL, Inc. et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv04181
Filed: October 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 234 Granting Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Bruce Mitchell Jacobs and Yeongyo Anna Suh Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
October 11, 2012 232 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 231 Re: Limited Stay of Order Denying Class Certification to Toll Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/11/12. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
September 7, 2012 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 171 , 188 Motion for Class Certification. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 20, 2012 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 225 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO FILE A STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/20/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
February 9, 2012 216 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 6, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
October 6, 2011 199 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 186 Regarding Continued Class Certification Briefing and Discovery Schedule. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/6/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 187 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte denying 167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 29, 2011 183 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 182 for late filing of declaration in support of plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
May 19, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 161 Regarding Extension of Time to Complete Pre-Class Certification Discovery and Expert Reports. Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/19/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
February 3, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 147 Re: Leave for Filing of Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narayan et al v. EGL, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?