James et al v. Ignatius A. Piazza et al

Case Number: 5:2005cv04532
Filed: November 7, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2009 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON SETTLEMENT. The June 15, 2009 hearing is VACATED. On or before June 30, 2009, the parties shall file all necessary paperwork regarding the Final Terms of the Settlement for the Court's evaluation prior to the July 6 hear ing. Despite the termination of his role as Receiver, George Fisher shall remain the Courtappointed Special Master in this matter. Please see Order for further for specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 12, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT. Consistent with the Court's March 26, 2009 Order, Defendants Front Sight and Ignatius Piazza shall appear for the June 15, 2009 contempt hearing. Failure to appear will result in civil contempt sanctions by the Court. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 11, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009) Modified on 5/12/2009 (jwlc1, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT; ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING NOTIFICATIONOF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Certificate of service on or before 3/30/2009.Show Cause Response AND Deadline to file Identification of Substitute Counsel for Defendant Front Sight or Noticeof Self-Representation for Defendant Piazza due by 5/1/2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/11/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Please see Order for further specifics.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/25/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 6, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION re 156 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/6/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
January 8, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified by the Court re 150 Stipulation. The Court finds good cause to accept the parties' Stipulation. However, to be clear, the hearing was originally set in light of the parties' dispute regarding whether Defe ndant Ignatius A. Piazza is a proper party for the judgment debtor examination. If the parties intend to bring other motions, the parties must notice those motions in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/8/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. Ignatius A. Piazza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?