Ho v. Ernst & Young LLP

Case Number: 5:2005cv04867
Filed: November 29, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2013 350 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 348 to Withdraw Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/16/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
December 17, 2012 345 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/17/12. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
January 11, 2012 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 309 , 311 Motion to Add a New Representative Plaintiff. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
October 19, 2011 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 298 Motion for Leave to Move for Reconsideration(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
March 10, 2011 277 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
December 20, 2010 274 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 17, 2010 270 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER STRIKING THE DECLARATIONS OF COLM DRISCOLL AND PAUL ESTRADA FROM PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re (269 in 5:05-cv-04867-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/16/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
September 27, 2010 268 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND FOR PLANITIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 2, 2010 266 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 265 ). The Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 12/17/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 30, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 261 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 08/30/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 17, 2010 236 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXCEED APPLICABLE PAGE LIMIT FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING (approving 233 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/17/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
July 15, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEFENDANT ERNST & YOUNG LLP'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RE MEAL AND REST BREAK CLAIMS AND CLAIMS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF OF PLAINTIFFS JOSEPH LANDON AND SARAH FERNANDEZ (granting 222 in Case 5:05-cv-04867-JF; granting 67 in Case 5:08-cv-02853-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/15/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 6, 2010 229 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF CLASS ACTION, AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (approving 228 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 10, 2010 227 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR FILING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF CLASS ACTION, AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (approving 226 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/7/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
December 3, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 215 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2009 is CONTINUED to 12/11/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/3/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
August 27, 2009 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion to Compel. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
July 10, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER The Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2009 is CONTINUED to 7/24/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/10/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
May 7, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/7/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 20, 2009 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION PURPOSES ONLY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/20/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 9, 2009 185 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference re 182 . Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/9/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 6, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 178 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/6/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
January 15, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
November 20, 2008 176 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (175 in 5:05-cv-04867-JF) RELATING CASES AND ASSIGNING RICHARDS ACTION TO JUDGE FOGEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/17/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ho v. Ernst & Young LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?