Thomas v. Celaya et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv00489
Filed: January 25, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 87 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/29/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
April 21, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/16/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
December 17, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/16/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2008)
October 27, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE SUPPLEMENT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/24/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Celaya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?