Express Diagnostics Int'l, Inc. v. Tydings et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv01346
Filed: February 23, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2010 352 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal re 350 Stipulation. Barry M. Tydings, Zyon Int'l, Inc., Merina T. Kisera and Premium Diagnostics Int'l, Inc. terminated. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
June 19, 2009 347 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER JOINT STATUS REPORT re 345 Notice. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Case Status Report on or before June 26, 2009. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/19/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 12, 2009 346 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice of Defendants Beentjes and Twin Spirit re 344 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall submit a Status Report re: remaining Defendants and claims to be trial. Status Report due by 6/25/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 15, 2009 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 338 Objection, filed by Express Diagnostics Int'l, Inc., 337 Objection, filed by Express Diagnostics Int'l, Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 15, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
April 30, 2009 340 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST COUNTER-DEFENDANT AND PLAINTIFF EDI Submitted on behalf of Amedica Biotech, Inc. with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1), as to this counter defendant ONLY re 335 Stipulation. Counter-claimant Amedica Biotech, Inc. and Counter-defendant Express Diagnostics Int'l, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/30/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 13, 2009 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull re 286 291 313 314 315 Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Without Prejudice to Renewed Motions after the Parties Meet and Confer as Required by this Court's Civil Local Rules 1-5(n) and 37-1(a).(pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 19, 2009 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 278 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 312 Motion (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 5, 2009 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 306 Letter filed by Patrick A. Beentjes. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 15, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 197 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 212 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 217 Motion ; denying 253 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
November 18, 2008 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Individual Statement of Facts. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 18, 2008. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 3, 2008 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 197 , 212 , 253 . Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics Signed by Judge James Ware on November 3, 2008. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008) Modified docket text on 11/5/2008 (x2)(ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Express Diagnostics Int'l, Inc. v. Tydings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?