Perez et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv01962
Filed: March 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 733 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 705 Motion to Vacate ; denying 706 Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment and to Set Aside or Amend Findings (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 19, 2013 732 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/19/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
February 1, 2013 728 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on MOTION TO VACATE ORDERS DENYING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND LEAVE TO AMEND, AND TO SET ASIDE OR AMEND FINDINGS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60, 52 re 725 MOTION to Vacate or Continue February 28, 2013 Case Management Conf erence filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.,, Certified Automotive Parts Assocation, Allstate Indemnity Co.,, GEICO General Insurance Co.,, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/01/2013. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 727
October 25, 2012 718 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 694 Bill of Costs filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/25/12. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
September 20, 2012 702 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 689 Motion to Reassign Case; granting 689 Motion to Reopen Case; granting 700 Motion to Reassign Case. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
August 29, 2012 688 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on August 29, 2012. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
July 31, 2012 661 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF ALLEN WOOD; DENYING PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 31, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 10, 2012 655 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 653 NOTICE by Certified Automotive Parts Assocation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Erica Fenby and Proposed Order. Attorney Erica L. Fenby terminated. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on July 10, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 605 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 591 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion For Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/9/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
December 15, 2011 590 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 588 Stipulation filed by Sarah Perez. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
September 29, 2011 532 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 530 Stipulation,,,, filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Ins. Co.,, Certified Automotive Parts Assocation, Rachel Hardyck, Rachel Stewart, State Farm General Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty Company, Allstate Insurance Company, Allsta te Property and Casualty Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, Sarah Perez, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co., Michelle Lackney, Allstate Indemnity Co.,, GEICO General Insurance Co.,, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/29/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 531 Opinion or Order of the Court Set/Reset Deadlines as to 454 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, 449 MOTION to Dismiss Or For More Definite Statement., ORDER Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 1, 2011 440 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES DISCOVERY MOTIONS. SEE DOCKET NOS. 412, 413, 415. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 1, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES' DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on July 1, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 16, 2011 373 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES' DISCOVERY MOTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 352 Motion for Discovery; denying 349 Motion for Discovery; denying 354 Motion for Discovery (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
May 31, 2011 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FURTHER DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 314 Motion; granting 317 Motion; granting 325 Motion (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
April 29, 2011 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' FURTHER MOTION TO COMPEL re 305 Letter filed by Sarah Perez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 29, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 22, 2011 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING MERITS DISCOVERY PLAN PURSUANT TO MARCH 23, 2011 REFERRAL; ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 197 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 20, 2011 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GEICO'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 254 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 11, 2011 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 195 Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 4, 2011 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE re 252 Statement filed by Sarah Perez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on April 4, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
January 28, 2011 214 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 189 Stipulation filed by Sarah Perez. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 28, 2011. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 10, 2011 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Counsel Gregory Baruch re 192 Notice (Other). Attorney Gregory Baruch terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/10/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 21, 2010 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 176 Stipulation. The previous schedule shall remain unchanged to advance the case. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/21/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 8, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re 174 Notice of Change In Counsel. Attorney Paul L. Stoller terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/8/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 23, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Granting Request to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint re 172 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/23/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 19, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Counsel Colin S. Stretch re 170 Notice (Other). Attorney Colin S. Stretch terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/19/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
September 15, 2010 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION; SCHEDULING ORDER re 155 Stipulation. ***CMC Deadlines terminated. Since the parties represent that the pleadings are notsettled, the Court finds that the Conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Manage ment Conference is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the following schedule: Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Moti on Hearing set for 11/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Plaintiffs shall notice and file their Motion in accordance with the Civil Local Rules of the Court. None of the dates set in this Order may be changed without an order of the Court made after a motion is filed pursuant to the Civil Local Rules of Court. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/15/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
August 9, 2010 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF NINTH CIRCUIT REMAND re 153 USCA Memorandum. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
May 13, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Relating To Scheduling Of Motions To Dismiss re 122 Stipulation. Deadline to file Motion to Dismiss on or before 5/15/2009; Deadline to file oppositions on or before 6/5/2009; Deadline to file replies on or before 6/12/2009. Joint Case Management Conference statement due 6/19/2009. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2009 09:00 AM; Case Management Conference 6/29/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?