Baldwin et al v. Dangerfield et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv02467
Filed: April 7, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2009 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/26/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 24, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 175 for Leave to File Surreply to Defendants' Motion In Limine to Limit Damages for Entry into Plaintiffs' Backyard to Nominal Damages. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/23/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
September 8, 2008 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 to Vacate Trial Date and Schedule Trial Setting Conference. Trial Setting Conference set for 9/19/2008 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin et al v. Dangerfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?