McCurdy v. Simpson

Case Number: 5:2006cv02830
Filed: April 26, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/5/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
April 29, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PROVIDE COURT WITH CURRENT ADDRESS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/24/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
November 5, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 GRANTING THIRD REQUEST FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/28/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
September 2, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 41 SECOND REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File Opposition, DENYING 42 MOTION to Produce. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/26/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCurdy v. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?