Rich v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Case Number: 5:2006cv03361
Filed: May 22, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
October 1, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING A NATIONWIDE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING FAIRNESS HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/1/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
March 8, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING 62 , 86 MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 2, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 103 JOINT STIPULATION RE FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2010 is CONTINUED to 5/7/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
January 14, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 101 STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 is CONTINUED to 2/26/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 14, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/14/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
October 27, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 78 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motion Hearing and Case Managment Conference set for 2/5/2010 AT 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/22/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
September 14, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 76 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING RESCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2009 is CONTINUED to 1/8/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 74 JOINT STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. The Motion for Class Certification set for 11/20/2009 is CONTINUTED to 1/8/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/13/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
July 20, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER BY JUDGE JEREMY FOGEL GRANTING 68 MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
April 24, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 58 STIPULATION REQUESTING FURTHER MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/24/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
January 20, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 55 STIPULATION REQUESTING MODIFICATION OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/16/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rich v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?