In re Juniper Derivative Actions

Case Number: 5:2006cv03396
Filed: May 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER INTERIM ORDER Re Parties Mid-Deposition Dispute Regarding Assertion of Attorney-Client Privilege. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/4/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 2, 2009 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the November 17, 2008 Stipulated Discovery Plan in In Re Juniper Networks, Inc. Securities Litigation, Case No. 06-4327 JW. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/2/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 21, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Parties' Mid-Deposition Dispute Regarding Assertion of Attorney-Client Privilege. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/19/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 9, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Parties' Mid-Deposition Dispute Regarding This Court's Prior Order re Allocation of Time Among the Parties for Deposition Questioning. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/9/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
August 3, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re (300 in 5:06-cv-04327-JW). Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 8/3/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 15, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (70 in 5:08-cv-00246-JW) Shortening Time for Hearing Motion for Protective Order Regarding Depositions. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 7/15/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 7/15/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Juniper Derivative Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?