Aristocrat Technologies et al v. International Game Technology et al
Case Number: 5:2006cv03717
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 ORDER 1055 for Dismissal of All Claims and Counterclaims. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/30/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 *** CLERK'S ERROR. DOCUMENT FILED IN WRONG CASE. PLEASE DISREGARD ***
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (Claim of Inequitable Conduct with Respect to Petition to Revive Abandoned Patent Application). Signed by Judge Whyte on 05/06/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 ORDER by Judge Whyte finding as moot 1026 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 1030 Motion to Shorten Time (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 986 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting in part and denying in part 920 Motion to Compel (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 Further Interim ORDER re 920 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 28, 2011. (psglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 Interim ORDER re 920 MOTION to Compel Production Of Documents. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 24, 2011. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 942 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER 964 Granting Filing of Aristocrat's Corrected Second Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/3/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 944 Motion to Take Deposition(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 947 Motion to Shorten Time (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 937 INTERIM ORDER re 920 Defendants Motion to Compel Documents. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/12/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 917 Motion to Strike. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER by Judge Whyte finding as moot 897 Motion to Strike and vacating hearing. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER re 736 , 796 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order. Signed by Judge Whyte on 8/3/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER re 882 Aristocrat's Objections to IGT's Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/21/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 868 Request for Supplemental Briefing. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 873 Unredacted ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 702 , 843 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims. 861 Redacted order previously filed on 6/15/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 862 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney Fees. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 861 Redacted ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 702 , 843 Motion for Leave to File. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER by Judge Whyte withdrawing 686 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint.(rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 828 FURTHER INTERIM ORDER re 711 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Document Request Nos. 3, 18, 22, 27-29 and 32-35. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 5/20/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 799 Motion to Seal Portions of Aristocrat's Opposition to IGT's Motion to Stay and Portions of Terry W. Ahearn's Declaration. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER re 784 MOTION to Seal Portions of Aristocrat's Opposition to IGT's Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims & Exhibits to the Dec. of Jeremy T. Elman ISO Opposition. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/6/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER re 705 , 743 Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Whyte on 5/4/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 782 INTERIM ORDER re 781 re Plaintiffs Expedited Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs' Document Request Nos. 3, 18, 22, 27-29 and 32-35. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/29/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Amended Scheduling ORDER. Signed by Judge Whyte on 4/14/10. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER by Judge Whyte taking motions 443 , 601 , 646 , 649 , 683 , 686 , 695 , 702 , 705 , 711 , 738 , 743 , 755 off calendar (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 771 STIPULATION AND ORDER 769 Extending Stay. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/9/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 765 STIPULATION AND ORDER 761 Staying Action and Modifying Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/23/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER RE: 699 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION TO THEIR EXPERT WITNESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/19/2009. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 697 Motion to Shorten Time for Defendants' Motion for Additional Depositions and to Take Depositions After the Discovery Deadline (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER REGARDING PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS: 191 , 214 , 242 , 243 , 257 , 625 , 631 , 652 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/30/09. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 661 SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/22/09. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER Changing Time on Plaintiffs' Motion to File Sur-reply and Supplemental Prosecution History Excerpts. Signed by Judge Whyte on 07/01/09. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 587 JOINT ORDER re: letters addressed to the Court. (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 502 Motion for Clarification And/Or Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 525 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 549 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 531 REGARDING PENDING MOTION TO COMPEL (DOCKET 191 ) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER RE: PENDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS 191 , 214 , AND 243 AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS 242 . (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE AND ADDITIONAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER re: 476 by Magistrate Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' motion to compel (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 486 STIPULATION AND ORDER 475 Vacating Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendants' Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/30/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting unopposed motion to shorten time (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 460 STIPULATION AND ORDER 456 to Bring Equipment Into the Courtroom. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 446 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 442 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by IGT, 441 Proposed Order filed by Australia PTY Limited, Aristocrat Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/19/2009. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 434 STIPULATION AND ORDER 433 Releasing Supersedeas Bond. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/21/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aristocrat Technologies et al v. International Game Technology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?