Shloss v. Sweeney et al Featured Case

Complaint for a declaratory judgment and injunction. Stanford author of biography of James Joyce's daughter in which the publisher redacted large amounts due to threats of lawsuit by Joyce estate. Author wanted to put supporting material on website. Raises issue of fsir use applied to scholarly biographies and how far copyright law can be used in order to protect a family's privacy. Related case: c 07-00517 MEJ http://cyberlaw.stanford.edu/case/shloss-v-estate-of-Joyce

Plaintiff: Carol Loeb Shloss
Defendant: Sean Sweeney and The Estate of James Joyce
Case Number: 5:2006cv03718
Filed: June 12, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Remark - file returned to FRC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Order from USCA Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees on appeal. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. as to 119 Notice of Appeal filed by The Estate of James Joyce, Sean Sweeney (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Remark file received from FRC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 USCA Case Number 09-16397 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for 119 Notice of Appeal filed by The Estate of James Joyce, Sean Sweeney. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 119 Notice of Appeal (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order request file from FRC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 118 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Report and Recommendations by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 7/27/2009. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 95 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 114 Report and Recommendations.; granting 115 Motion (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OBJECTION to 114 Report and Recommendations byThe Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Anna, Raimer) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition re 115 MOTION to correct clerical error in report and recommendation for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byThe Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Anna, Raimer) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Motion to Correct Clerical Error in Report and Recommendation for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; Declaration of Bernard A. Burk filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burk, Bernard) (Filed on 5/15/2009) Modified on 5/15/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Carol Loeb Shloss Objections to R&R due by 5/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/11/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2009 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd (Date Filed: 4/7/2009) re 95 (Tape #FTR.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Alan Lemley (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss in Support of 107 Reply Memorandum in Support of Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Burk, Bernard) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Declaration of Anthony T. Falzone in Support of 107 Reply Memorandum in Support of Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Burk, Bernard) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Declaration of Bernard A. Burk in Support of 107 Reply Memorandum in Support of Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Related document(s) 107 ) (Burk, Bernard) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Reply Memorandum re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Burk, Bernard) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Declaration of Sarah Conway in Support of 104 Memorandum in Opposition to Carol Shloss's Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byThe Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Anna, Raimer) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Declaration of Anna E. Raimer in Support of 104 Memorandum in Opposition to Carol Shloss's Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byThe Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G, # 2 Exhibits H-L)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Anna, Raimer) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Memorandum in Opposition re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byThe Estate of James Joyce. (Anna, Raimer) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Declaration of Julie A. Ahrens in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Ahrens, Julie) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Declaration of Bernard A. Burk in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Declaration of Robert E. Spoo in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Declaration of Christopher K. Ridder in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Declaration of David S. Olson in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Declaration of Anthony T. Falzone in Support of 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 95 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Proposed Order re 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Application for Determination of Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 87 Motion (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
December 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Vacating Hearing 87 Motion. The Court vacates the hearing set for 12/10/2007. The matter is submitted on the papers without oral argument. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Reply Memorandum re 87 MOTION Judicial Clarification of Bases for Prior Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Declaration of Maria K. Nelson in Support of 90 Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Judicial Clarification of Bases for Prior Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B, Part 1# 3 Exhibit B, Part 2)(Related document(s) 90 ) (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified text on 11/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Response to Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Judicial Clarification of Bases for Prior Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/29/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order FILE LOCATED AT FEDERAL RECORDS CENTER (FRC) San Bruno, CA. Accession #:021-07-0061; Location #: 735524; Box #: 174. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing from 11/12/2007 to 12/10/2007 re 87 Motion for Judicial Clarification of Bases for Prior Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Declaration of Julie A. Ahrens in Support of 87 MOTION Judicial Clarification of Bases for Prior Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 87 ) (Ahrens, Julie) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION Judicial Clarification of Bases for Prior Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Ahrens, Julie) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
May 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs re 73 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/30/2007. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2007) Modified relationship on 10/3/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Response re 81 Objection to Exhibits A, B, J and Q to the Declaration of David S. Olson byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Olson, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Declaration of Anthony T. Falzone in Support of 82 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Olson, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Declaration of David Olson in Support of 82 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Olson, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007)
May 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Reply in support of plaintiff's 73 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Olson, David) (Filed on 5/21/2007) Modified on 5/22/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OBJECTIONS to Exhibits A, B, J, and Q to the 74 Declaration of David S. Olson by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Declaration of Maria K. Nelson in Support of Defendants' 78 Opposition to Plaintiff's 73 Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6)(Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 5/14/2007) Modified on 5/15/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Hearing from 5/21/2007 to 6/4/2007 re 76 Stipulation filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/27/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing Date of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees From May 21, 2007 Until June 4, 2007 by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Proposed Order re 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Olson, David) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Declaration of David S. Olson in Support of 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit J# 10 Exhibit K# 11 Exhibit L# 12 Exhibit M# 13 Exhibit N# 14 Exhibit O# 15 Exhibit P# 16 Exhibit Q# 17 Exhibit R# 18 Exhibit S# 19 Exhibit T# 20 Exhibit U)(Related document(s) 73 ) (Olson, David) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Olson, David) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
March 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE WITH PREJUDICE re 71 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/28/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2007) Modified on 3/28/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Actions and Proposed Order by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit A Part 1# 3 Exhibit A part 2# 4 Exhibit A part 3# 5 Exhibit A part 4# 6 Exhibit A part 5# 7 Exhibit A part 6# 8 Exhibit A part 7)(Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 3/26/2007)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 3/19/2007 by Mediator, Debra L. Mellinkoff; Mediation session held 3/16/2007; Case fully settled; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2007)
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER The clerk shall CONSOLIDATE C07-517 MEJ with LEAD CASE C06-3718 JW ALL Future filings shall be filed in LEAD case C06-3718 JW by Judge James Ware granting 60 , Consolidating Cases (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007) Modified on 3/16/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/10/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
March 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/12/2007 before James Ware (Date Filed: 3/13/2007). Further Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2007 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2007)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
February 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Defendants'ANSWER to Plaintiff's 14 Amended Complaint by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 2/26/2007) Modified on 2/28/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED re 62 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Carol Loeb Shloss, 64 Proposed Order filed by Carol Loeb Shloss, 63 Declaration in Support filed by Carol Loeb Shloss, Motions terminated: 62 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2007 10:00 AM. Case Management Conference Statement due by 3/2/2007. Please see Order for Specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/21/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2007)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Proposed Order re 62 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related by Carol Loeb Shloss. (McLaughlin, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Declaration of Dorothy R. McLaughlin in Support of 62 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Related document(s) 62 ) (McLaughlin, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. (McLaughlin, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/15/2007)
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 63 . *** Declaration of Dorothy McLaughlin in Support of 60 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Related document(s) 60 ) (McLaughlin, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/14/2007) Modified on 2/16/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKETS # 62 and # 64 . *** MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting motion)(McLaughlin, Dorothy) (Filed on 2/14/2007) Modified on 2/16/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 1/31/07 before Judge James Ware, Court Reporter: Georgina Galvan Colin. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial and Trial Setting Conference set for 9/8/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Close of All Discovery due by 5/8/2008. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/9/2007. Please see Order for Specifics. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007) Modified on 2/13/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Granting in Part Defendants' Motion to Strike; denying as moot 46 Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
February 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Status Conference set for 9/8/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Discovery due by 5/5/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2007)
February 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/31/2007 before James Ware (Date Filed: 2/2/2007) MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION FOLLOWING ORAL ARGUMENTS re 50 . (Court Reporter Gina Galvan-Colin.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2007)
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Response TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATIONS byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 1/30/2007) Modified on 2/7/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE DECLARATION OF ANTIONETTE D. DOZIER AND THE DECLARATION OF ANNA E. RAIMER by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 1/30/2007) Modified on 2/7/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' 21 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Strike, Carol Loeb Shloss's Amended Complaint filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 1/25/2007) Modified on 2/6/2007, link to motion (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Fed. Rule Civ. P.26(f) Report filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/24/2007)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OBJECTIONS to the Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss, the Declaration of David S. Olson, Exhibits A, P, R and T to the Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss, and Exhibits 2, 3, 4, and 5 to the Declaration of Robert Spoo by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/23/2007)
January 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SECOND ORDER RESCHEDULING 1/29/2007 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS re 48 Order; Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2007 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/18/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2007)
January 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Defendants' Statement of Recent Decision in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Strike, Carol Loeb Shloss's Amended Complaint filed bySean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" to Defendants' Statement of Recent Decision)(Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/11/2007)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/9/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Proposed Order re 46 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Objections And Motion To Strike Portions Of The Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss, Portions of the Declaration of David S. Olson, Exhibits A, P, R And T to the Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss, and Exhibits 2, 3, 4 by Sean Sweeney. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Objections And Motion To Strike Portions Of The Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss, Portions of the Declaration of David S. Olson, Exhibits A, P, R And T to the Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss, and Exhibits 2, 3, 4 and 5 to the Declaration of Robert Spoo filed by Sean Sweeney. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2007 09:00 AM. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of Antionette D. Dozier in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition filed bySean Sweeney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 40 ) (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Declaration of Anna E. Raimer in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition filed bySean Sweeney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2)# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 40 ) (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Declaration of Edward Beckett in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition filed bySean Sweeney. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Declaration of Sam Slote in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition filed bySean Sweeney. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Declaration of Patricia Donlon in Support of 40 Reply to Opposition filed bySean Sweeney. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Reply to Opposition to Defendants're 21 Motion to Dismiss, Or In The Alternative to Strike, Carol Loeb Shloss's Amended Complaint filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 1/8/2007) Modified on 1/26/2007, link to motion (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 3/16/2007 at 10:00 AM at the SF office of Jones Day, located at 555 California Street, Suite 2600. Written statements due no later than 3/6/2007. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Declaration of David Olson in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2)# 3 Exhibit A (Part 3)# 4 Exhibit A (Part 4)# 5 Exhibit B (Part 1)# 6 Exhibit B (Part 2)# 7 Exhibit B (Part 3)# 8 Exhibit B (Part 4)# 9 Exhibit B (Part 5)# 10 Exhibit B (Part 6)# 11 Exhibit B (Part 7)# 12 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Declaration of Robert Spoo in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Declaration of John Etchemendy in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Declaration of David Pierce in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Declaration of Jonathan Galassi in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Declaration of Leon Friedman in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Declaration of Carol Loeb Shloss in Support of 32 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss , OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STRIKE, CAROL LOEB SHLOSS'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 12/15/2006)
December 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Mediator has scheduled the Pre MED phone conference for 12/15/2006 at 8:30 a.m. PST. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2006)
November 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Debra L. Mellinkoff as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Falzone, Anthony) (Filed on 11/21/2006)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 EXHIBITS in support of 26 declaration of Grace Smith filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Modified on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28 EXHIBITS in support of 26 declaration of Grace Smith Declaration filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Modified on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 27 EXHIBITS in support of 26 Declaration of Grace Smith filed bySean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006) Modified on 11/20/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Grace Smith filed bySean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Strike, Carol Loeb Shloss's Amended Complaint by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Declaration of Sean Sweeney in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Carol Loeb Shloss's Complaint filed bySean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Declaration of Maria K. Nelson in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Carol Loeb Shloss's Complaint filed bySean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss , OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STRIKE, CAROL LOEB SHLOSS'S AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 11/17/2006)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation, Case referred to mediation. The Parties Agree to Hold the ADR Session by March 2007. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/15/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANITNG WITH MODIFICATIONS TO Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to DIsmiss Amended Complaint and Resetting CMC re 17 Stipulation filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2007 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/14/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
November 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Carol Loeb Shloss (Olson, David) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
November 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEF. MTN TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Carol Loeb Shloss. (Olson, David) (Filed on 11/10/2006)
November 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2006)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the amended complaint and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. Filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Bernard A. Burk (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Burk, Bernard) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 2, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint; Move Case Management Conference to 11/20/06 at 10 am. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/2/06. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint; Move Case Management Conference by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING re 9 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/12/06. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2006)
September 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 9/8/2006)
July 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 7/31/2006)
July 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (Nelson, Maria) (Filed on 7/13/2006)
July 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Spoo. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2006)
June 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File the return of summons docket number #4 and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2006)
June 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carol Loeb Shloss. Carol Loeb Shloss served on 6/13/2006, answer due 7/3/2006; The Estate of James Joyce served on 6/13/2006, answer due 7/3/2006. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2006. Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2006 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/12/06. (Attachments: # 1 standing order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert Spoo (fee paid) filed by Carol Loeb Shloss. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) jury demand against Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3386580.). Filed byCarol Loeb Shloss. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Proposed Order re 2 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert Spoo by Carol Loeb Shloss. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006) Modified on 6/13/2006 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Sean Sweeney, The Estate of James Joyce. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 12, 2006 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shloss v. Sweeney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Loeb Shloss
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Sweeney
Represented By: Maria Kara Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of James Joyce
Represented By: Maria Kara Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?