Miletak et al v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Number: 5:2006cv03778
Filed: June 15, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring revised proposed order. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 28, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 16, 2012 373 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 372 Joint MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF FOR AN ORDER MOVING THE HEARING ON THE JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FROM FEBRUARY 27, 2012 TO MARCH 5, 2012 re 371 Proposed Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, S filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Vlaho Miletak, Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 24, 2012 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as modified re 364 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Continuing Deadline for Filing of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (For Administrative Relief) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Vlaho Miletak, Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/24/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
October 25, 2011 352 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement; Preliminary Pretrial Conference is vacated.Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 1/6/2012. Motions in limine due by 1/6/2012. Bench Trial set for 2/21/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. James Ware. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 2/22/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Jame s Ware. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 2/24/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. James Ware. Bench Trial set for 2/28/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/25/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
August 2, 2011 311 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 309 Stipulation, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Vlaho Miletak, Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/2/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 14, 2011 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
April 29, 2011 280 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER Granting 263 Defendants' Motion to Compel a Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Compliant Expert Disclosure; ALTERNATIVE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re defendants' request for evidentiary sanctions. Objections due by 5/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/29/2011. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 21, 2011 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. In light of the parties' contention that the matter is not currently ready for trial and the pending Motions, the Court finds that a Pretrial Conference is premature at this time. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 6/10/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/20/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
November 10, 2010 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statementdue by 1/14/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
May 3, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED CLASS NOTICEre 252 Notice (Other) filed by Vlaho Miletak, 253 Notice (Other) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James Ware on May 3, 2010. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 7, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CLASS NOTIFICATION PLAN; RESERVING DECISION ON PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE; SETTING DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF JOINT PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE re 249 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, 250 Notice (Other) filed by Vlaho Miletak. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/7/10. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 5, 2010 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company, 241 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Vlaho Miletak, 243 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Vlaho Miletak. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/5/10. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
October 1, 2009 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CLASS DISCOVERY DEADLINE; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENTCONFERENCE re 201 Joint Case Management Statement. The Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2009 is VACATED. Deadline to complete class discovery due 10/22/2009. All o ther deadlines set in 199 Scheduling Order shall remain the same. Discovery disputes are referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
May 15, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 177 Motion to Dismiss; denying 180 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
September 18, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 166 Motion for Leave to File a Fourth Amended Complaint by 9/30/08(jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) Modified on 9/19/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miletak et al v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?