Watson et al v. County of Santa Clara et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv04029
Filed: June 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 582 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/20/2013. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
August 29, 2013 576 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re further briefing on 535 MOTION for Attorney Fees (permitting defendants to respond to plaintiffs' itemization of services) (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
December 4, 2012 545 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 538 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
October 31, 2012 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 534 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 30, 2012 541 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 533 Request for Administrative Relief.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
August 22, 2012 511 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/22/2012. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
March 29, 2012 489 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 488 Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2012 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/29/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 485 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 483 Application for Interlocutory Appeal(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
January 11, 2012 482 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte on 465 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and For New Trial. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
May 17, 2011 470 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 468 Granting/Authorizing Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' JMOL / New Trial MotionSigned by Judge Whyte on 05/17/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 6, 2011 467 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 457 of the Court Re: Pending Attorney Fee Motion and Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/6/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 28, 2011 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 458 Defendants' motion for leave to exceed page limit. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
March 21, 2011 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Witness. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/21/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 15, 2011 428 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER No. 2 Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/15/2011. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 7, 2011 427 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/7/2011. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 426 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 425 for Dismissal, Linda Castaldi, John Hamilton, Janet Kahle, David Kearns, Yazmina Letona, Anita Noble, Jewels Ramirez, Mary Ritter, Vu Tran, Aaron West, Linda Baum and Sharon Burgan terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/7/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
December 15, 2010 424 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 420 for Dismissal of Defendants. Signed by Judge Whyte on 12/15/2010. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 24, 2010 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding 415 Motion for Approval of Minors' Compromise. Signed by Judge Whyte on 11/24/2010. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010).
August 17, 2010 386 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 384 Tolling Time to Object to Evergreen Defendants' Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/17/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
July 26, 2010 377 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defendants Rima Singh, Clifton Black, Rose Real, Robert Pruitt, Cheryl Harms, Claudia Blodgett, Gary Kishimoto, Joella Molloy and Evergreen School District. Signed by Judge Whyte on 7/26/10. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
June 30, 2010 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 367 Motion to Shorten Time for hearing motion to dismiss, and setting briefing schedule (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
May 20, 2010 361 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 359 to Modify Scheduling Order. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/20/10. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
April 2, 2010 348 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 304 Ex Parte Application ; granting 336 Ex Parte Application (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 343 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 342 to Modify Scheduling Order: Jury Trial set for 8/23/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/2/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
November 16, 2009 330 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 313 to Extend Time by One Court Day for Filing Opposition to Defendant City of San Jose's Motion for Summary Judgement or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
October 22, 2009 278 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER re 122 Ex Parte Application to File Document Under Seal filed by Janet Kahle, Sharon Burgan, Yazmina Letona, Rajul Kazi, Mary Ritter, George Kennedy, Aaron West, Jewels Ramirez, County of Santa Clara, John Hamilton, David Kearns, Rima Singh, Ann Miller Ravel, Anita Noble, Norma Sparks, Vu Tran. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/29/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (E-Filed on 10/22/2009) Modified on 11/7/2009 document was electronically posted on 10/22/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing dates on motions for summary judgment 174 , 177 , 207 , 209 , 230 , 233 , and 236 to December 4, 2009 at 2:00 pm. Signed by Judge Whyte on 9/8/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
August 28, 2009 252 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 250 Continuing Hearing on Motions by the Evergreen Defendants, Aaron West and City of San Jose Defendants: Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/28/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 27, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 248 Motion for Extension of Time. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 11, 2009 225 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 211 Regarding Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Aaron West. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/11/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 7, 2009 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 212 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 16, 2009 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 202 Regarding Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment by Defendants Singh, West, Mailhot, Hamilton, Noble, Kahle, Ritter & Kearns. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/16/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
April 10, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting 184 Ex Parte Application to Extend Date for Hearing and Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
March 26, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Dismiss; granting 147 Motion to Dismiss; granting 150 Motion to Dismiss; granting 153 Motion to Dismiss; granting 156 Motion to Dismiss (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
January 29, 2009 164 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 161 to Continue Trial and All Pretrial Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 1/25/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Discovery cutoff 6/5/2009. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
January 2, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 141 Clarifying Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/2/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/2/2009)
November 7, 2008 137 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/7/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
October 3, 2008 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 119 Motion to Vacate. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?