Leonard Feld DDS,Inc. et al v. Heeter et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv04031
Filed: June 29, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2014 210 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Complaint and Cross-Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP (a)(2) filed by Leonard Feld, ***Deadlines terminated. 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal of Complaint and Cross-Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP (a)(2) filed by Leonard Feld.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
October 30, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 202 Stipulation filed by South Bay Dental Services, Inc. Status Report due by 11/27/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 8, 2013 201 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING STATUS re 200 Stipulation filed by South Bay Dental Services, Inc. Status Report due by 10/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/8/13. 2/11/14 trial and related trial deadlines vacated.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
August 26, 2013 198 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SPECIAL MASTER FEES. 9/26/13 motion hearing vacated 197 Stipulation filed by Leonard Feld. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 9, 2013 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re 185 Notice (Other) filed by Marshall Castle. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
July 19, 2013 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION TO REAPPORTION SPECIAL MASTER'S FEES (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 2, 2013 178 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 177 Continuance of Hearing and Mediation deadline to 8/26/13 filed by South Bay Dental Services, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
January 3, 2013 167 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 166 Re: New Schedule for Pending Matters filed by South Bay Dental Services, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
October 5, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/2/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard Feld DDS,Inc. et al v. Heeter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?