In re APPLE COMPUTER, INC., DERIVATIVE LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2006cv04128
Filed: June 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2008 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 222 Motion for Settlement (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 30, 2008 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 244 JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER SEALING PORTIONS OF OBJECTION SUBMITTED TO THE COURT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/30/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEALING PORTIONS OF OBJECTIONS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 27, 2008 231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 223 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/24/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
September 8, 2008 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT. Final Settlement Hearing set for 10/31/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 213 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 203 to Extend Page Limit on Nominal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Derivative Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/5/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re APPLE COMPUTER, INC., DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?