Wyatt v. Kirkland

Case Number: 5:2006cv04228
Filed: July 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/5/10. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
November 10, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
August 25, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
June 17, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
March 18, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
February 13, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
October 15, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Service; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/10/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt v. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?