In re Silicon Storage Technology, Inc. Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv04310
Filed: July 13, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT SILICON STORAGE TECHNOLGY, INC. re 158 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/14/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
February 19, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE (granting 148 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/19/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
January 20, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE (approving 144 ). The Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2010 are CONTINUED to 4/30/2010 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
July 17, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS BRIEFING SCHEDULE (approving 123 ). Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/17/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 7, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 79 , 83 & 85 MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/7/09. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
May 28, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 19, 2009 (approving 115 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 is CONTINUED to 7/10/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/27/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
March 9, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 110 ). Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/9/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
January 27, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FEBRUARY 6, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 13, 2009. Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2009 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/26/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 2, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 92 to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/26/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
October 6, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 75 to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/2/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 24, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/19/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
February 1, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 50 Stipulation filed by Mike Brien Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2008 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/1/08. (jfsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
August 3, 2006 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES re 3 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12(B) filed by Behrad Bazargani,. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/27/06. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Silicon Storage Technology, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?