IN RE:JUNIPER SECURITIES LITIGATION

Case Number: 5:2006cv04327
Filed: July 14, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2012 633 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE AN AMENDED MOTION AND PROPOSED ORDER; CONTINUING HEARING, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 626 MOTION for Order Approving Distribution of Net Settlement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/11/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
May 12, 2010 610 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH ERNST & YOUNG AND PROVIDING NOTICE TO THE CLASS. Final Fairness Hearing set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 4, 2010 607 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion to Appear by Telephone re (166 in 5:08-cv-00246-JW) MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the May 10, 2010 Preliminary Approval Hearing, (601 in 5:06-cv-04327-JW) MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the May 10, 2010 Preliminar y Approval Hearing. Lead Plaintiff's Counsel is granted to appear by telephone. Counsel shall contact Court Call to set up the telephonic appearance. Local Counsel shall appear in person for the scheduled 5/10/2010 hearing. *** Motions terminated: (166 in 5:08-cv-00246-JW), (601 in 5:06-cv-04327-JW). Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/4/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
April 13, 2010 598 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARINGS ON CERTAIN MOTIONS re 596 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/13/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 597 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE re (161 in 5:08-cv-00246-JW) Stipulation, (592 in 5:06-cv-04327-JW) Proposed Order. Motion Hearing re Final Approval of Class Settlement set for 8/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 24, 2010 588 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING Extension of Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions re 585 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 8, 2010 573 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Soliciting Further Briefing and Taking 427 Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Ernst & Young LLP under Submission. Signed by Judge Patrica V. Trumbull on 3/8/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 4, 2010 568 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 560 Shortening Time for Hearing, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Opposition due by 2:00 Pacific time on March 5, 2010. Reply due by NOON on March 8, 2010. Hearing at 10:00 a.m. on March 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/3/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 16, 2010 535 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT ; Withdrawing 319 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings re 534 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 319 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Set/Reset Dea dlines as to 534 Stipulation: Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2010 10:00 AM. On or before 3/15/2010, the parties shall file their Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement with a Proposed Order and all supporting declarations. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/16/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 11, 2010 531 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Soliciting Additional Briefing Regarding Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production from Defendant Lisa C. Berry and Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production from Third-party KLA-Tencor Corporation(pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 3, 2010 529 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 520 the Juniper Defendants' Discovery Requests. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 2/2/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 29, 2010 523 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY KLA-TENCOR AND DEFENDANT LISA C. BERRY re 522 Stipulation, filed by New York City Pension Funds. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 29, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 28, 2010 521 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON LEAD PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT ERNST & YOUNG, AND SOLICITING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on January 28, 2010. (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 21, 2010 513 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 506 Regarding Lead Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Ernst & Young LLP's First Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/21/10. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 12, 2010 496 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Continue Deadline for Exchange of Expert Reports re 491 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/12/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
December 18, 2009 474 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 437 Allowing Depositions to Proceed After the December 1, 2009 Discovery Cutoff, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/18/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 9, 2009 459 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 448 Lead Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Ernst & Young LLP's First Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/9/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 8, 2009 450 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 440 re Juniper Networks, Inc.'s Fifth Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 16-32). Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/8/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 7, 2009 447 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 446 the Juniper Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Admission and Sixth Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 12/7/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 30, 2009 439 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 438 Renoticing Hearing on Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Ernst & Young LLP AS MODIFIED BY COURT. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/30/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 16, 2009 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME re 369 Proposed Order. The Motion to Consolidated Cases 368 has been set for hearing on 11/23/2009 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
September 28, 2009 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Denying Without Prejudice 329 Lead Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant Ernst & Young to Produce a 30(b)(6) Witness; Denying 331 Motion to Shorten Time as Moot. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 2, 2009 318 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT SETTING DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT RE DISCOVERY re 313 Stipulation. Accordingly, on or before 9/4/2009, the parties shall file their Joint Status Report. The Report shall include, among other things, an update on the parties' discovery efforts and if relevant, any request for modification of the current Case Schedule. Upon reviewing the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court will set a Conference to coincide with the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, if necessary. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/1/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
June 11, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MOOT re Enlarging Lead Plaintiff's Time to Amend the Berry Complaint and Scheduling Case Management Conference re (58 in 5:08-cv-00246-JW) Stipulation, (260 in 5:06-cv-04327-JW) Stipulation. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint in the Berry Action on June 5, 2009. The Court declines to set a case management conference on June 15, 2009 in the Juniper Action as this time. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/11/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
May 14, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT Expanding Page Limits for Juniper Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification re 258 Stipulation. Opposition brief shall not exceed 30 pages; Reply brief shall not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/14/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)
April 9, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 256 Withdrawing as Moot Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Juniper to Produce Drafts of SEC Filings. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 4/7/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
April 6, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery re 205 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/2/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 31, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION re 252 Withdrawing Motion to Compel Trading Records. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/30/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 26, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT EXTENDING TIME FOR OPPOSITION TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, AND REPLY IN SUPPORT THEREOF re 244 Proposed Order. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 218 MOTION to Certify Class. Motions t erminated: 242 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/26/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 20, 2009 248 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 247 Continuing Juniper Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Lead Plaintiff to Produce Trading Records. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 3/20/09. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 13, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull Granting 200 Defendant Juniper Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Lead Plaintiff to Provide a Further Response to Interrogatory No. 4. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 4, 2009 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS PREMATURE re 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 188 Case Management Statement. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file Mot ion for Class Certification on or before 3/2/2009, Deadline for Defendants to file their Opposition to classcertification on or before 5/1/2009, Deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Reply in support of class certification on or before 6/15/2009. Mot ion Hearing re Class Certification set for 6/29/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2009. Motions terminated: 183 MOTION for Summary Judgment The Juniper Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication Regarding Loss Causation on August 10, 2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
December 12, 2008 182 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference from 2/2/2009 to 2/9/2009 re 181 Proposed Order. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
November 25, 2008 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 176 Motion for Administrative relief (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 20, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED DISCOVERY PLAN re 173 Proposed Order filed by New York City Pension Funds. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/17/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 5, 2008 174 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 . Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 11/4/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 22, 2008 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 10/22/08. (pvtlc1) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 19, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as Modified by the Court for Shortened Time Hearing Juniper Defendants re 144 MOTION to Consolidate Related Cases re 146 Proposed Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Plaintif f's opposition filed by 9/22/08; responses of L. Berry or Ernst & Young filed by 9/24/08; Plaintiff's response filed by 9/26/08; Juniper Defendants SHALL file reply by 9/26/08 Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/18/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE:JUNIPER SECURITIES LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?