American Chemical Society et al v. Commax Technologies, Inc., et.al.

Case Number: 5:2006cv04414
Filed: July 19, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AND JUDGMENT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 268 Stipulation. In the event of a dispute arising out of the Settlement Agreement, any party may file a breach of contract action in a court of competent jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/29/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
April 16, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Amend Complaint; Denying Temporary Restraining Order; Shortening Time to Hear Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re 213 Stipulation. Motions terminated: 205 Ex Parte Application fo r Order Shortening Time. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 213 Stipulation, 206 MOTION to Amend Complaint to Add Fraudulent Conveyance Claim and for Limited Discovery, 207 MOTION Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
February 4, 2009 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING INTERIM PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 199 Pretrial Conference Statement. The parties will have an opportunity to apprise the Court of their progress toward trial and settlement efforts at the Final Pretrial Conference, currently set for 4/6/2009 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/4/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
December 12, 2008 197 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Dates re 196 Stipulation. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/12/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Chemical Society et al v. Commax Technologies, Inc., et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?