Micron Technology, Inc. v. Mosaid Technologies Incorporated

Case Number: 5:2006cv04496
Filed: July 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:145 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE NUMBER CV-09-1838-JF. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/13/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
February 5, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re 226 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/3/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 22, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 218 Stipulation filed by Micron Technology, Inc. Motions terminated: 188 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Micron Technology, Inc., 197 MOTION to Compel Production of Micron Witness For Deposition filed by Mosaid Technologies Incorporated, 149 Amended MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory filed by Micron Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/22/09. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
January 7, 2009 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel denying 204 Motion to Hear Discovery Matters; denying 205 Motion to Shorten Time (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 19, 2008 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 185 MOTION to Change Time. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/19/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
November 4, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE CLAIMS BETWEEN MOSAID AND POWERCHIP re 176 (re 412 in 5:08-cv-04494-JF). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/3/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
October 28, 2008 175 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER re 174 . Jury Trial set for 5/22/2009 01:30 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 5/8/2009 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/24/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 15, 2008 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 170 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Heather M. Khassian. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/10/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micron Technology, Inc. v. Mosaid Technologies Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?