In re Atmel Corporation Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv04592
Filed: July 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeremy Fogel granting 361 Motion for Settlement. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
April 29, 2010 339 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 338 ). Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/29/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
February 3, 2010 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 271 plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order. Hearing set for 2/9/2010 is vacated. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 29, 2010 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 237 Motion to Compel by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 21, 2010 279 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE re 273 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
December 28, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT ROSS'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/28/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 18, 2009 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE re 257 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/18/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) Modified on 12/28/2009 (dlm, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2009 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/15/2009. (jflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
September 21, 2009 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/15/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 14, 2009 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/10/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 24, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re Atmel Corporation's Discovery Motion. Motion hearing re 223 set for 9/29/2009, 10:00 AM. Defendant Ross' opposition due by 9/8/2009. Atmel's reply due by 9/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/24/4009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 17, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING 223 MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LLOYD. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/17/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
March 13, 2009 199 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/13/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
January 23, 2009 197 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 192 Amending J. Michael Ross' Answer to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/21/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
January 6, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 185 Extending Defendants' Date to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
October 29, 2008 179 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC AND DEFENDANTS' DATE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (approving docket no. 178 ). Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/29/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 26, 2008 177 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving docket no. 176 ). Case Management Conference set for 10/10/08 is CONTINUED to 11/21/2008 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/26/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Atmel Corporation Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?