In Re Blue Coat Systems, Inc. Derivative Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv04809
Filed: August 8, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2011 110 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/14/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 14, 2011 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on January 14, 2011.
November 15, 2010 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DERIVATIVE SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE re 92 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/12/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
October 6, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 8, 2010 re 89 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 20, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 87 ). The Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2010 is CONTINUED to 10/8/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/20/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 2, 2010 86 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 85 ). The Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/24/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/2/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 11, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2010 is CONTINUED to 9/3/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/9/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
July 12, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 81 ). The Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2010 is CONTINUED to 8/13/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/12/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 9, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 79 ). The Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 is CONTINUED to 7/16/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/9/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
March 31, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 76 . Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
December 7, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 70 ). The Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2009 is CONTINUED to 2/19/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 12/7/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
September 9, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 68 ). The Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2009 is CONTINUED to 12/18/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/8/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
July 2, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 65 ). The Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2009 is CONTINUED to 9/11/2009 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/2/2009. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
March 31, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Date for Case Management conference re 62 . Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/31/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
January 5, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving document no. 59 ). Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/5/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
October 1, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/30/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Blue Coat Systems, Inc. Derivative Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?