Melgoza v. Kirkland

Case Number: 5:2006cv04861
Filed: August 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 71 Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 08/13/2015. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
September 26, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 71 Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. The court will permit further litigation in this action in order to provide Petitioner with an opportunity to show cause and prejudice to overcome the procedural default. Petiti oner may file an opening brief on this topic of no more than 10 pages on or before 10/24/2014. The State may file an opposition brief of no more than 10 pages on or before 11/14/2014. Petitioner may then file a reply brief of no more than 5 pages on or before 11/26/2014. A ruling on Petitioner's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment will be held in abeyance during this additional briefing. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 09/26/2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
October 15, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the Court's Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Denying Certificate of Appealability, judgment is entered in favor of Respondent Warden Richard Kirkland against Petitioner Adrian Melgoza. A certificate of appealability will not be issued. The Clerk shall close this file. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/12/2012. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
January 14, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge James Ware denying 27 Motion for indication of willingness to entertain Rule 60(b) motion; terminating 29 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melgoza v. Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?