In re Apple Inc. Securities Litigation

Case Number: 5:2006cv05208
Filed: August 24, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT FUND (granting 196 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/14/2012. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
May 17, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 142 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; GRANTING 143 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES; AND GRANTING IN PART 176 OBJECTOR PEZZATI'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND INCENTIVE AWARD. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 5/17/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
November 22, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, AND SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT FAIRNESS HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/22/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 12, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, AND SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT FAIRMESS HEARING re 116 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/7/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 5, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS (approving 124 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/5/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 29, 2010 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 120 JOINT MOTION FOR HEARING ON SHORTENED TIME (AS MODIFIED). A Motion Hearing is set for 10/7/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. The Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2010 is CONTINUED to 10/7/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 9/29/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
August 31, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS re 113 . Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/31/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 29, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS (approving 109 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 7/29/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 24, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING MATTERS re 107 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/24/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
April 30, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CONSOLIDATED ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/29/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 27, 2010 103 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving 102 ). The Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2010 is CONTINUED to 6/11/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/27/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 8, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING AND RELATED MATTERS (approving 100 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/8/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Apple Inc. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?