Berkowitz v. Fodor et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv05353
Filed: August 30, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Patricia V. Trumbull
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Continuance of Approval Hearing from 4/27/2009 to 5/4/2009 re 134 Status Report. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
March 18, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING HEARING FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT re 132 Joint Case Management Statement. Deadline to file documents set for April 17, 2009. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/18/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
January 21, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 21, 2009. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
December 10, 2008 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 127 Case Management Statement. The parties are to file a joint case management statement by 1/16/2008.The Statement shall, among other things, update the Court on the status of the parties settlement e fforts and include a good faith discovery plan with a proposed date for the close of all discovery. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/10/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 9, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Responding to SECOND AMENDED Complaint re 124 Stipulation filed by Affymetrix, Inc. The parties have already complied with the 12/4/2008 deadline. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/9/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
November 24, 2008 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Responding to Complaint re 121 Stipulation. Deadline to File Answer on 12/3/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/24/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 20, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPONDING TO COMPLAINT re 118 Stipulation. Deadline to file answer by 11/24/2008. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/20/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkowitz v. Fodor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?