Doe v. City of San Jose et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06307
Filed: October 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 94 Vacating Trial Date and Allowing Additional Briefing on Remaining Claims. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/7/09. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 14, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
November 17, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing date. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
September 29, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Whyte denying John Doe's Motions to Vacate his Settlement with the County Defendants and a Request for Further Information re 60 , 62 (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008) Modified on 10/23/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court **POSTED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT #46** STIPULATION AND ORDER 40 Dismissing with Prejudice the Complaint of Plaintiff in Favor of Defendant County of Santa Clara. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/6/08. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008) Modified on 3/13/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?