Herriot v. Channing House

Case Number: 5:2006cv06323
Filed: October 10, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy Fogel
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE re 113 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/18/10. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
April 9, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 105 STIPULATION TO STAY THIS COURT'S ORDER OF JANUARY 29, 2009 AND ISSUE AN INJUNCTION PENDING APPEAL (terminating 101 Motion To Stay). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 4/9/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009)
March 12, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/10/09. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
March 2, 2009 96 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 95 . Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/2/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 25, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTING COUNSEL TO CONFER RE HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY; AND EXTENDING STAY PENDING DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR STAY. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/25/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
January 29, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 71 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND GRANTING 63 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/29/09. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
November 14, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 83 STIPULATION TO THE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, MICHAEL ALLEN. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/14/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 3, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING MOTIONS AND EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (approving docket no. 76 ). Hearing on motions for summary judgment and reconsideration set for 11/21/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/3/08. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 14, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 Extending Page Limit on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 10/9/08. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 18, 2006 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Sally Herriot,. Signed by Judge Judge Fogel on 10/18/06. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herriot v. Channing House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?