Cobb v. Woodford et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv06372
Filed: October 11, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald M. Whyte
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/29/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
July 31, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Providing Plaintiff Notice and Warning; Scheduling Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/30/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
October 24, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Partial Dismissal; Order of Service; Directing Defendants to File Dispositive Motion or Notice Regarding Such Motion. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 10/24/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
August 12, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
June 24, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER After Remand REOPENING CASE; Order of Partial Dismissal With Leave to Amend or Notify Court of Intent to Proceed With Original Complaint. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/24/11. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?